Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB730 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2021

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 730
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 8, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 730 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of State Highway 66 in
 Rockwall County as the Commissioner David Magness Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.190 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.190.  COMMISSIONER DAVID MAGNESS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a) The portion of State Highway 66 in Rockwall County is
 designated as the Commissioner David Magness Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Commissioner David Magness Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *