Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB793 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/20/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 793     87R1618 JCG-F   By: Campbell         Veteran Affairs & Border Security         3/19/2021         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Texas Border Security Medal recognizes the service and sacrifice of Texas Military Department service members for securing the Texas southern border during both state and federal activation.   The award requirements and parameters:    On mission on or after 28 July 2014 May be awarded to service members from: Texas Military Department (SAD/T32), other states (National Guard) and United States (active duty) 90 consecutive days on orders requirement Recipients will receive a medal set and not a ribbon    Only service members currently on Operation Guardian Support will receive the actual medal set with the award. A service member under prior border operations will have to pay for  his or her medal sets. This will reduce cost to the Texas Military Department and parallels the process for federal awards.  S.B. 793 creates the Texas Border Security Medal for service members who served 90 consecutive days during the specified dates at the Texas southern border.   As proposed, S.B. 793 amends current law relating to a ribbon for certain service members of the military who served in support of operations to secure this state's international border.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 437.355(a), Government Code, as follows:   (a) Authorizes the governor or adjutant general, if delegated the authority, to adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding certain medals and ribbons, including the Texas Border Security and Support Service Ribbon, which is to be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the United States who served on or after July 28, 2014; who served on state active duty or active duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code, for at least 90 consecutive days, or in response to an emergency activation; and who served honorably in support of operations under civilian authority to secure this state's international border.   SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2021.     

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 793
87R1618 JCG-F By: Campbell
 Veteran Affairs & Border Security
 3/19/2021
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 793

87R1618 JCG-F

By: Campbell

 

Veteran Affairs & Border Security

 

3/19/2021

 

As Filed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Texas Border Security Medal recognizes the service and sacrifice of Texas Military Department service members for securing the Texas southern border during both state and federal activation.

 

The award requirements and parameters:

 

 

Only service members currently on Operation Guardian Support will receive the actual medal set with the award. A service member under prior border operations will have to pay for  his or her medal sets. This will reduce cost to the Texas Military Department and parallels the process for federal awards.  S.B. 793 creates the Texas Border Security Medal for service members who served 90 consecutive days during the specified dates at the Texas southern border.

 

As proposed, S.B. 793 amends current law relating to a ribbon for certain service members of the military who served in support of operations to secure this state's international border.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 437.355(a), Government Code, as follows:

 

(a) Authorizes the governor or adjutant general, if delegated the authority, to adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding certain medals and ribbons, including the Texas Border Security and Support Service Ribbon, which is to be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the United States who served on or after July 28, 2014; who served on state active duty or active duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code, for at least 90 consecutive days, or in response to an emergency activation; and who served honorably in support of operations under civilian authority to secure this state's international border.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2021.