Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB794 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 794
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 1, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for the exemption from ad valorem taxation
 of the residence homestead of a totally disabled veteran.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.131(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  A disabled veteran who has been awarded by [receives
 from] the United States Department of Veterans Affairs or its
 successor 100 percent disability compensation due to a
 service-connected disability and a rating of 100 percent disabled
 or of individual unemployability is entitled to an exemption from
 taxation of the total appraised value of the veteran's residence
 homestead.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *