Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB794 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 794


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for the exemption from ad valorem taxation
 of the residence homestead of a totally disabled veteran.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.131(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  A disabled veteran who has been awarded by [receives
 from] the United States Department of Veterans Affairs or its
 successor 100 percent disability compensation due to a
 service-connected disability and a rating of 100 percent disabled
 or of individual unemployability is entitled to an exemption from
 taxation of the total appraised value of the veteran's residence
 homestead.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 794 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 794 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor