Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB796 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2021

                    By: Schwertner, Bettencourt, Buckingham S.B. No. 796
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 31, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 3; March 31, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 796 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to hearing and public notice requirements regarding the
 purchase or conversion by a municipality of certain properties to
 house homeless individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 8, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 255 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 255.  PURCHASE OR CONVERSION OF PROPERTY FOR CERTAIN
 PURPOSES
 Sec. 255.001.  SPECIAL HEARING AND NOTICE REQUIREMENTS FOR
 PURCHASE OR CONVERSION OF PROPERTY TO HOUSE HOMELESS INDIVIDUALS.
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (e), the governing body of a
 municipality may not approve the purchase of a property or the
 conversion of a property under the municipality's control for the
 purpose of providing housing to homeless individuals unless the
 governing body holds a public hearing before the purchase or
 conversion of the property for that purpose. The hearing must be
 held at a location within a two-mile radius of the property.
 (b)  Not later than 36 hours before a public hearing required
 under Subsection (a) is held, the governing body of a municipality
 must provide notice of the hearing by mail to each residence located
 within a two-mile radius of the property the municipality proposes
 to purchase or convert for a purpose described by that subsection.
 (c)  If the governing body of a municipality fails to comply
 with this section, an individual who is entitled to notice under
 Subsection (b) may bring an action in a district court in the county
 in which the property described by that subsection is located for
 injunctive relief to prevent the purchase or conversion of the
 property.
 (d)  In the event of a conflict between this chapter and any
 provision in the charter of a municipality relating to the purchase
 or conversion or notice of the purchase or conversion of a property
 for a purpose described by Subsection (a), this chapter controls.
 (e)  This section does not apply to the purchase or
 conversion of a property to provide temporary shelter or housing
 during a natural disaster, declared state of emergency, or other
 life-threatening public emergency.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 255, Local Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to the purchase or conversion of property
 described by Section 255.001(a), Local Government Code, as added by
 this Act, that becomes final on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *