Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB838 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2021

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 838
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 28, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 838 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authorization by a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school for a person to carry or possess a
 weapon on school premises for purposes of safety and security.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.0814 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0814.  SCHOOL GUARDIANS. (a)  In this section,
 "school guardian" means a person who, pursuant to the written
 regulations or written authorization of a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school under Section 46.03(a)(1)(A), Penal
 Code, is authorized to carry or possess a specified weapon for the
 purpose of providing safety and security on the physical premises
 of a school, any grounds or building on which an activity sponsored
 by a school is being conducted, or a passenger transportation
 vehicle of a school.
 (b)  The Texas School Safety Center shall develop best
 practices for school districts and open-enrollment charter schools
 that authorize school guardians to provide safety and security.
 (c)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school
 that has adopted written regulations or written authorization
 allowing for school guardians shall report any information relating
 to the implementation of the regulations or authorization and the
 identity of each school guardian to:
 (1)  the Texas School Safety Center, in the form and
 manner prescribed by the center; and
 (2)  a state or local law enforcement agency, on
 written request of the head of the agency.
 (d)  Information reported under Subsection (c) is
 confidential and is not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code, by a school district, an open-enrollment charter
 school, the Texas School Safety Center, or a law enforcement
 agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *