Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB851 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2021

                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 851
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 30, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 15,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the cybersecurity council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2054.512(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The cybersecurity council must include:
 (1)  one member who is an employee of the office of the
 governor;
 (2)  one member of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (3)  one member of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; [and]
 (4)  one member who is an employee of the Elections
 Division of the Office of the Secretary of State; and
 (5)  additional members appointed by the state
 cybersecurity coordinator, including representatives of
 institutions of higher education and private sector leaders.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *