Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB858 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2021

                    By: Johnson, Paxton S.B. No. 858
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 9, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 9, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 858 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure of information collected by a
 metropolitan rapid transit authority, regional transportation
 authority, municipal transit department, or coordinated county
 transportation authority under the public information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 451.061, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (f) and adding Subsection (g) to read as
 follows:
 (f)  Except as provided by Subsection (g), personal
 [Personal] identifying information collected by an authority is
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number; [and]
 (3)  trip data, including the time, date, origin, and
 destination of a trip, and demographic information collected when
 the person purchases a ticket or schedules a trip; and
 (4)  other personal [financial] information, including
 financial information.
 (g)  Personal identifying information described by
 Subsection (f)(3) may be disclosed to a governmental agency or
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, by an authority if the requestor confirms in
 writing that the use of the information will be strictly limited to
 use in research or in producing statistical reports, but only if the
 information is not published, redisclosed, sold, or used to contact
 any individual.
 SECTION 2.  Section 452.061, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), personal
 [Personal] identifying information collected by an authority is
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number; [and]
 (3)  trip data, including the time, date, origin, and
 destination of a trip, and demographic information collected when
 the person purchases a ticket or schedules a trip; and
 (4)  other personal [financial] information, including
 financial information.
 (f)  Personal identifying information described by
 Subsection (e)(3) may be disclosed to a governmental agency or
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, by an authority if the requestor confirms in
 writing that the use of the information will be strictly limited to
 use in research or in producing statistical reports, but only if the
 information is not published, redisclosed, sold, or used to contact
 any individual.
 SECTION 3.  Section 453.104, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 453.104.  FARES AND OTHER CHARGES. (a) The board shall,
 after a public hearing, impose reasonable and nondiscriminatory
 fares, tolls, charges, rents, or other compensation for the use of
 the transit department system sufficient to produce revenue,
 together with receipts from taxes imposed by the transit
 department, in an amount adequate to:
 (1)  pay all the expenses necessary to operate and
 maintain the transit department system;
 (2)  pay when due the principal of and interest on, and
 sinking fund and reserve fund payments agreed to be made with
 respect to, all bonds that are issued by the board and payable in
 whole or part from the revenue; and
 (3)  fulfill the terms of any other agreement with the
 holders of bonds described by Subdivision (2) or with a person
 acting on behalf of the bondholders.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), personal
 identifying information collected by a transit department is
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number;
 (3)  trip data, including the time, date, origin, and
 destination of a trip, and demographic information collected when
 the person purchases a ticket or schedules a trip; and
 (4)  other personal information, including financial
 information.
 (c)  Personal identifying information described by
 Subsection (b)(3) may be disclosed to a governmental agency or
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, by a transit department if the requestor confirms
 in writing that the use of the information will be strictly limited
 to use in research or in producing statistical reports, but only if
 the information is not published, redisclosed, sold, or used to
 contact any individual.
 SECTION 4.  Section 460.109, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), personal
 [Personal] identifying information collected by an authority is
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552,
 Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number; [and]
 (3)  trip data, including the time, date, origin, and
 destination of a trip, and demographic information collected when
 the person purchases a ticket or schedules a trip; and
 (4)  other personal [financial] information, including
 financial information.
 (f)  Personal identifying information described by
 Subsection (e)(3) may be disclosed to a governmental agency or
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, by an authority if the requestor confirms in
 writing that the use of the information will be strictly limited to
 use in research or in producing statistical reports, but only if the
 information is not published, redisclosed, sold, or used to contact
 any individual.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for information that is received by a regional
 transportation authority, metropolitan rapid transit authority,
 municipal transit department, or coordinated county transportation
 authority on or after the effective date of this Act. A request for
 information that was received before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the request was
 received, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *