Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB874 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    S.B. No. 874


 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting and expiration dates of a temporary
 health insurance risk pool administered by the commissioner of
 insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1510.012(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning June 1, 2022 [2020], not later than June 1 of
 each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1510.013, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1510.013.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
 August 31, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 874 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 874 passed the House on
 May 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 9, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor