Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB886 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Blanco, Campbell S.B. No. 886
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2021; March 11, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 1, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of citizenship assistance to veterans by
 the Texas Veterans Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.027.  CITIZENSHIP ASSISTANCE FOR VETERANS. On
 request of a veteran, the Texas Veterans Commission shall evaluate
 the veteran's citizenship status in order to:
 (1)  educate and direct the veteran in becoming a
 United States citizen; and
 (2)  facilitate the veteran's naturalization process.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *