Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB910 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 910


 AN ACT
 relating to a study of options for implementing family preservation
 services, the provision of certain other health and human services
 by certain state agency contractors, and the repeal of a prior pilot
 program for family-based safety services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B-1, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.1691 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.1691.  STUDY OF OPTIONS FOR IMPLEMENTING FAMILY
 PRESERVATION SERVICES. (a) In this section, "family preservation
 service" means a time-limited, family-focused service, including:
 (1)  a service subject to the Family First Prevention
 Services Act (Title VII, Div. E, Pub. L. No. 115-123), provided to
 the family of a child who is:
 (A)  a candidate for foster care to prevent or
 eliminate the need to remove the child and to allow the child to
 remain safely with the child's family; or
 (B)  a pregnant or parenting foster youth;
 (2)  enhanced in-home support services and
 non-recurring financial support to promote safe and stable
 families; and
 (3)  services to promote self-sufficiency and prevent
 further need for interaction in the child welfare system.
 (b)  The department shall study and develop a comprehensive
 list of options for implementing family preservation services in
 existing catchment areas, including:
 (1)  contracting with single source continuum
 contractors to provide services; and
 (2)  procuring service providers through a competitive
 bidding process.
 (c)  In developing the options under Subsection (b), the
 department shall:
 (1)  examine existing department functions related to
 the stage of service the department describes as family-based
 safety services, including assessments of child safety and child
 removals, and make recommendations for incorporating the functions
 into a contracted model;
 (2)  consider the results from community needs
 assessments and capacity development plans conducted during the
 preceding 10 years; and
 (3)  consider:
 (A)  contingent on appropriation, including Title
 IV-E prevention services in the delivery of community-based family
 preservation services and the appropriate use of those services;
 (B)  the financial modeling used to determine
 implementation costs, including:
 (i)  start-up funding costs;
 (ii)  the cost of purchased client services;
 (iii)  strategies for shared financial risk;
 and
 (iv)  rate methodology;
 (C)  procedures for transitioning between case
 stages, including transitions from:
 (i)  investigation to family preservation;
 and
 (ii)  family preservation to foster care;
 (D)  ways to maximize evidence-based services and
 to increase the evidence base for family preservation programs in
 this state;
 (E)  requirements for complying with federal law
 to receive matching funds for certain prevention services;
 (F)  appropriate performance measures for
 contracted services, including associated financial remedies and
 incentives;
 (G)  ways to incorporate and to maximize existing
 funding methods for and programs related to behavioral health and
 substance use provided by the Health and Human Services Commission;
 (H)  appropriate contract provisions to ensure a
 clear distinction of money, personnel, and processes for family
 preservation services and foster care services;
 (I)  conflict resolution procedures between the
 department and contractors concerning:
 (i)  service plans;
 (ii)  services; and
 (iii)  case action for children or families
 served by a contractor;
 (J)  appropriate oversight structures to manage
 contract compliance, contractor performance, and child and family
 safety;
 (K)  appropriate contract provisions to ensure
 community engagement, including appropriate partnerships with
 faith-based organizations;
 (L)  recommendations for statutory changes
 necessary to support the department's implementation options; and
 (M)  any other information the department
 determines necessary for legislative direction of the department's
 implementation of community-based family preservation services.
 (d)  In developing implementation options under this
 section, the department shall:
 (1)  incorporate relevant information obtained from
 previous efforts and similar service models implemented in other
 states;
 (2)  collaborate with the Health and Human Services
 Commission as needed, including on:
 (A)  recommendations for the provision of
 behavioral health and substance use services; and
 (B)  appropriate rate methodology; and
 (3)  allow interested persons to comment on the
 provision of behavioral health and substance use services.
 (e)  The department may enter into any contracts the
 department determines necessary to comply with this section.
 (f)  This section expires August 31, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  The following laws are repealed:
 (1)  Section 264.169, Family Code; and
 (2)  Section 40.0581(f), Human Resources Code.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than October 1, 2022, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall submit copies of the options
 described by Section 264.1691, Family Code, as added by this Act,
 along with any associated recommendations, to the:
 (1)  governor;
 (2)  lieutenant governor;
 (3)  speaker of the house of representatives;
 (4)  House Committee on Appropriations;
 (5)  Senate Committee on Finance;
 (6)  House Committee on Human Services; and
 (7)  Senate Committee on Health and Human Services.
 SECTION 4.  The Department of Family and Protective Services
 is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations that are available
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 910 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 910 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 8, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor