Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB941 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/25/2021

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 941
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2021; March 11, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 25, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 25, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 941 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the adoption of a state scenic byways program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 391, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 391.256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 391.256.  SCENIC BYWAYS PROGRAM.  (a)  The department
 shall plan, design, and establish a program for designating
 highways as State Scenic Byways.
 (b)  The program must include a process by which the
 department:
 (1)  receives proposals from political subdivisions or
 other community groups approved by the department for funding
 projects in accordance with 23 U.S.C. Section 162;
 (2)  applies for grants under 23 U.S.C. Section 162 for
 the projects; and
 (3)  allows an applicant who consents to pay for the
 costs of the projects that are not covered by grants made under 23
 U.S.C. Section 162.
 (c)  A highway must be designated as a State Scenic Byway
 under the program established by this section before the department
 applies for a grant under Subsection (b)(2) for a project related to
 the highway.
 (d)  The department may use money from the state highway fund
 to pay for the costs of a project that are not covered by a grant
 made under 23 U.S.C. Section 162.
 (e)  The department may only designate a highway described by
 Section 391.252 as a State Scenic Byway.
 (f)  The commission by rule shall prohibit outdoor
 advertising in a manner consistent with 23 U.S.C. Section 131(s) on
 a State Scenic Byway designated under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
 Department of Transportation shall establish the program required
 by Section 391.256, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, and
 the Texas Transportation Commission shall adopt rules as necessary
 to implement that section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *