Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB941 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/18/2021

                    S.B. No. 941


 AN ACT
 relating to the adoption of a state scenic byways program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 391, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 391.256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 391.256.  SCENIC BYWAYS PROGRAM.  (a)  The department
 shall plan, design, and establish a program for designating
 highways as State Scenic Byways.
 (b)  The program must include a process by which the
 department:
 (1)  receives proposals from political subdivisions or
 other community groups approved by the department for funding
 projects in accordance with 23 U.S.C. Section 162;
 (2)  applies for grants under 23 U.S.C. Section 162 for
 the projects; and
 (3)  allows an applicant who consents to pay for the
 costs of the projects that are not covered by grants made under 23
 U.S.C. Section 162.
 (c)  A highway must be designated as a State Scenic Byway
 under the program established by this section before the department
 applies for a grant under Subsection (b)(2) for a project related to
 the highway.
 (d)  The department may use money from the state highway fund
 for a project that receives a grant made under 23 U.S.C. Section 162
 only for the purpose of satisfying matching funds requirements for
 the grant.
 (e)  The department may only designate a highway described by
 Section 391.252 as a State Scenic Byway.
 (f)  The commission by rule shall prohibit outdoor
 advertising in a manner consistent with 23 U.S.C. Section 131(s) on
 a State Scenic Byway designated under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
 Department of Transportation shall establish the program required
 by Section 391.256, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, and
 the Texas Transportation Commission shall adopt rules as necessary
 to implement that section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 941 passed the Senate on
 March 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 941 passed the House on
 May 11, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 113, Nays 30, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor