Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB965 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 965
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2021; March 11, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 31, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 965 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rate filing requirements for certain personal lines
 insurers with low market shares.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2251.252, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsections (b), [and] (c), and
 (d), an insurer is exempt from the rate filing and approval
 requirements of this chapter if the insurer, during the calendar
 year preceding the date filing is otherwise required under this
 chapter, issued residential property insurance policies in this
 state that accounted for less than two percent of the total amount
 of premiums collected by insurers for residential property
 insurance policies issued in this state, more than 50 percent of
 which cover property:
 (1)  valued at less than $100,000; and
 (2)  located in an area designated by the commissioner
 as underserved for residential property insurance under Chapter
 2004.
 (d)  An insurer described by Subsection (a) that increases
 the premium rates charged policyholders for a residential property
 insurance product by an annual average amount of eight percent or
 greater for three consecutive calendar years must file the
 insurer's proposed rates in accordance with this chapter in the
 calendar year following the three consecutive years and, if
 applicable, obtain approval of the proposed rates as provided by
 this chapter. In calculating the three consecutive calendar years'
 average premium increases, an insurer is not required to consider a
 year in which there is a weather-related catastrophe or other major
 natural disaster that requires the commissioner to extend the
 claim-handling deadlines under Section 542.059(b).
 SECTION 2.  Section 2251.1025, Insurance Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a rate for an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2022. A rate for an
 insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before
 January 1, 2022, is governed by the law as it existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *