Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB969 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 969


 AN ACT
 relating to reporting procedures for and information concerning
 public health disasters and to certain public health studies;
 providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 81, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.016.  AVAILABILITY OF DATA REGARDING PUBLIC HEALTH
 DISASTER. During a public health disaster, the department shall
 timely make available to the public on the department's Internet
 website, in an easy-to-read format, all available de-identified
 public health data regarding the public health disaster.  The
 department must present data related to individuals as summary
 statistics consistent with the confidentiality provisions of
 Sections 81.046, 161.0073, and 161.008.
 SECTION 2.  Section 81.044(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The executive commissioner shall prescribe the form and
 method of reporting under this chapter[, which may be in writing, by
 telephone,] by electronic data transmission, through a health
 information exchange as defined by Section 182.151 if requested and
 authorized by the person required to report, or by other means.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 81, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 81.0443, 81.0444, 81.0445,
 81.0495, and 81.053 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.0443.  STANDARDIZED INFORMATION SHARING METHOD. The
 department shall collaborate with local health authorities,
 hospitals, laboratories, and other persons who submit information
 to the department during a public health disaster or in response to
 other outbreaks of communicable disease to plan, design, and
 implement a standardized and streamlined method for sharing
 information needed during the disaster or response. The department
 may require a person submitting information to the department under
 this subchapter to use the method developed under this section.
 Sec. 81.0444.  HOSPITAL TO REPORT. A hospital shall report
 to the department and to the applicable trauma service area
 regional advisory council all information required by the
 department related to a reportable disease for which a public
 health disaster is declared.
 Sec. 81.0445.  PROVISION OF INFORMATION TO PUBLIC DURING
 PUBLIC HEALTH DISASTER. (a)  This section applies only to
 information related to a reportable disease for which a public
 health disaster is declared.
 (b)  The department and each trauma service area regional
 advisory council shall make publicly available in accordance with
 Subsection (c) the information a hospital is required to report to
 the department and regional advisory council under Section 81.0444.
 The department and each regional advisory council shall ensure that
 information released under this subsection does not contain any
 personally identifiable information.
 (c)  The department shall collaborate and coordinate with
 local health departments to ensure that all information covering a
 reporting period is released to the public in a timely manner.
 (d)  The department shall develop and publish on its Internet
 website monthly compliance reports for laboratories reporting
 during a public health disaster. Each compliance report, at a
 minimum, must include:
 (1)  the number of laboratory reports the department
 receives by electronic data transmission;
 (2)  the number of incomplete information fields in the
 laboratory reports;
 (3)  the electronic format each laboratory used in
 submitting information;
 (4)  the number of coding errors in the laboratory
 reports; and
 (5)  the average length of time from the date the
 specimen is collected to the date the department receives the
 corresponding laboratory report.
 (e)  The department shall develop and publish on its Internet
 website monthly compliance reports for hospitals reporting during a
 public health disaster. Each compliance report, at a minimum, must
 include:
 (1)  the number of incomplete information fields in the
 hospital reports;
 (2)  the number of reports a hospital failed to submit
 in a timely manner; and
 (3)  the number of identified inaccuracies in the
 information submitted.
 Sec. 81.0495.  FAILURE TO REPORT; CIVIL PENALTY.  (a)  The
 department may impose a civil penalty of not more than $1,000 on a
 health care facility for each failure to submit a report required
 under this subchapter.
 (b)  The attorney general may bring an action to recover a
 civil penalty imposed under Subsection (a).
 Sec. 81.053.  DATA QUALITY ASSURANCE. The department shall
 implement quality assurance procedures to ensure that data
 collected and reported for a public health disaster is
 systematically reviewed for errors and completeness. The
 department shall implement procedures to timely resolve any
 deficiencies in data collection and reporting.
 SECTION 4.  (a) The Department of State Health Services
 shall evaluate the planning and response capabilities of the state
 health care system, including hospitals, long-term care
 facilities, and laboratories, to respond to public health threats.
 The department shall coordinate its evaluation with the Health and
 Human Services Commission, regional advisory councils, local
 health departments, and health care system organizations. The
 department shall submit to the legislature an implementation plan
 based on the findings of its evaluation not later than September 1,
 2022.
 (b)  The Department of State Health Services shall evaluate
 the current scope, size, function, and public health response
 capabilities of public health regions and regional offices. The
 department shall identify current capabilities, assess the need for
 geographic realignment, and identify ways to improve support to
 local health departments and areas in which the department serves
 as the primary public health provider. The department shall
 coordinate its evaluation with local health departments, areas
 served by department regional offices, and the Public Health
 Funding and Policy Committee. The department shall provide a
 report based on its evaluation to the legislature not later than
 September 1, 2022.
 (c)  The Department of State Health Services shall improve
 standardized data collection and reporting by the department,
 laboratories, health care facilities, local health departments,
 and other entities as appropriate during a declared public health
 disaster. The department shall identify current processes for and
 barriers to standardized, regular, and consistent reporting and
 shall collaborate on best practices to ensure that data collection
 and reporting are consistent across state, regional, and local
 levels. The department shall coordinate its analysis with regional
 advisory councils, local health departments, laboratories, health
 care facilities, and the Public Health Funding and Policy
 Committee. The department shall implement best practices and
 report its findings to the legislature not later than September 1,
 2022.
 SECTION 5.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement this
 Act.
 SECTION 6.  Section 81.044(a), Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a report submitted on or after
 January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  The Department of State Health Services is
 required to implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates
 money specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the department
 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for that purpose.
 (b)  The Department of State Health Services shall use any
 available federal money to implement this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 969 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 969 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 4, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor