Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR35 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/03/2021

                    S.C.R. No. 35


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, American Legion Luckett Cochran Post 296 in Mineola
 is celebrating the 100th anniversary of its founding with a special
 monthly meeting on March 25, 2021; and
 WHEREAS, The post is named for Luckett Cochran, a Mineola
 native and U.S. Army veteran of World War I; born in 1895, he
 graduated from Mineola High School in 1913 and subsequently
 enrolled at The University of Texas; on the eve of his graduation in
 1917, he left school to answer his nation's call to duty and
 enlisted in the army, receiving his commission as a first
 lieutenant of field artillery in August 1917; and
 WHEREAS, In France, Lieutenant Cochran was given command of
 Battery D, 6th Field Artillery, and he saw a great deal of action in
 the Tour and Cantigny sectors of the battlefront before returning
 to the United States in June 1918 to serve as an artillery
 instructor in South Carolina and Oklahoma; promoted to captain in
 September 1918, he married Johnnie Link on the 23rd of that month;
 while honeymooning in El Paso, he fell ill from the Spanish
 influenza, and, his lungs weakened by exposure to poison gas during
 the war, he died on October 2, 1918, at the age of 23; and
 WHEREAS, American Legion Post 296 was established on March
 25, 1921, with Oscar P. McCary as post commander and Charles B. Hart
 as adjutant; on the centennial of this event, the post's new
 officers will be sworn in, including Commander Ben Strange, 1st
 Vice Commander Larry Southard, 2nd Vice Commander Larry Pruitt,
 Adjutant John Ring, Chaplain Loy Frazier, and Sergeant at Arms Ed
 Shadbolt; and
 WHEREAS, Luckett Cochran wore his country's uniform with
 courage and distinction, and for 100 years, the members of Post 296
 have upheld his proud legacy through their faithful service to
 their nation and their community; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby commemorate the 100th anniversary of American Legion Luckett
 Cochran Post 296 and that all those associated with the post be
 extended sincere best wishes for the future; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for American Legion Luckett Cochran Post 296 as an
 expression of high regard by the Texas House of Representatives and
 Senate.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 35 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 19, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 35 was adopted by the House
 on April 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor