Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR39 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    S.C.R. No. 39


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The untimely death of noted attorney and admired
 civic leader Clyde Moody Siebman on March 4, 2021, at the age of 62,
 brought a great loss to his family, his friends, and the legal
 community in Texas and beyond; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Sherman on November 26, 1958, to Newell and
 Carol Siebman, Clyde Siebman grew up in Pottsboro and Plano with the
 companionship of his beloved sister, Annette, and numerous dear
 cousins; he received a dual bachelor's degree in business
 administration and psychology at Southern Methodist University,
 and while completing his juris doctor degree at SMU Dedman School of
 Law, he met his future wife, Carol Ann Mumm; they became the proud
 parents of a daughter, Elizabeth, and they were eventually blessed
 with a granddaughter, Kendall; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Siebman began his career as a law clerk for U.S.
 District Judge Paul Brown, inaugural judge of the Eastern District
 of Texas; in 1991, he became a founding partner of Siebman, Forrest,
 Burg, & Smith, known as Siebman & Siebman during the years he
 practiced with his wife, before she joined the judiciary; today,
 the firm has offices in Sherman and four other cities, and the legal
 team includes his daughter, Elizabeth Siebman Forrest, a named
 partner, and his niece, Becca Skupin, an associate; and
 WHEREAS, A national expert in intellectual property law,
 Mr. Siebman began handling such cases even before the Eastern
 District became a preferred venue for patent litigation; he was
 heavily involved in the New York Intellectual Property Law
 Association, the Leahy Institute of Advanced Patent Studies, and
 the Sedona Conference; moreover, he was frequently called upon to
 moderate judicial panels and appear at legal conferences across the
 country; he also visited Chinese universities with a delegation of
 attorneys and judges and lectured on U.S. trial practices; among
 myriad accolades, he was recognized by The Best Lawyers in America
 as 2018 Dallas/Fort Worth Lawyer of the Year for Patent Litigation
 and 2020 Dallas/Fort Worth Lawyer of the Year for Copyright
 Litigation; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Siebman regularly represented clients in
 complex commercial litigation in the Fifth U.S. Circuit Court of
 Appeals, as well as other venues, and he served his profession in
 numerous leadership roles; committed to innovation, he chaired the
 advisory board of the Institute for Law and Technology and served as
 an ex officio member of the board; he worked tirelessly in behalf of
 his colleagues in East Texas, founding the district's bar
 association and serving as its president; moreover, he was the
 driving force behind the association's Bench-Bar Conference of the
 Eastern District of Texas, one of the nation's foremost legal
 programs, and served as chair for a quarter century; he made further
 contributions as a member of several Eastern District committees
 and the State Bar of Texas Board of Directors; and
 WHEREAS, Highly engaged in civic life, Mr. Siebman served as
 Republican Party chair in Grayson County and as a member of the
 State Republican Executive Committee; he energetically supported
 GOP candidates at all levels and was instrumental in the ascendance
 of the Republican Party in the county and the state; nevertheless,
 he was happy to reach across the aisle in the public interest, and
 he received plaudits in the Eastern District for his work with a
 prominent local Democrat to fill vacant federal judgeships; in
 2000, he was a member of the Presidential Electoral College; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Siebman served on the Red River Boundary
 Commission and played a key role in resolving a dispute between
 Texas and Oklahoma dating back to the Louisiana Purchase; as
 conservator of the Riverbend Water Resource District, he helped
 settle a decades-long legal battle over water issues in East Texas
 and Southwest Arkansas, and he was appointed in 2017 to the Red
 River Interstate Compact Commission; he also served as chair of the
 North Texas Regional Airport Board and of the Grayson County
 Regional Mobility Authority; and
 WHEREAS, Clyde Siebman made a tremendous positive impact
 through his professional and civic contributions, earning the high
 esteem of all who knew him, but he will be remembered equally for
 his warmth, integrity, and kindness; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Clyde Moody Siebman and extend
 sincere condolences to his loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Clyde Moody Siebman.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 39 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 6, 2021, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 39 was adopted by the House
 on April 23, 2021, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor