Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR19 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/15/2021

                    By: Kolkhorst, Springer S.J.R. No. 19
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2020; March 3, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 15, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 15, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 19 By:  Seliger


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment establishing a right for
 certain residents receiving care in residential settings to
 designate an essential caregiver for in-person visitation.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article I, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 35 to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.  (a) A resident of a nursing facility, assisted
 living facility, intermediate care facility for individuals with an
 intellectual disability, residence providing home and
 community-based services, or state supported living center, as
 those terms are defined by general law, has the right to designate
 an essential caregiver with whom the facility, residence, or center
 may not prohibit in-person visitation.
 (b)  The legislature by general law may provide for
 guidelines for a facility, residence, or center described by
 Subsection (a) of this section to follow in establishing essential
 caregiver visitation policies and procedures.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment establishing a right
 for certain residents receiving care in residential settings to
 designate an essential caregiver for in-person visitation."
 * * * * *