Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR47 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/08/2021

                    87R9383 CAE-D
 By: Huffman, et al. S.J.R. No. 47


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment changing the eligibility
 requirements for certain judicial offices.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2(b), Article V, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  No person shall be eligible to serve in the office of
 Chief Justice or Justice of the Supreme Court unless the person:
 (1)  is licensed to practice law in the State of Texas;
 (2)  [this state and] is, at the time of election, a
 citizen of the United States and a resident of the State of Texas;
 (3)  [this state, and] has attained the age of
 thirty-five years;
 (4)  [, and] has been either:
 (A)  a practicing lawyer licensed in the State of
 Texas for at least ten years;[,] or
 (B) a practicing lawyer licensed in the State of
 Texas and judge of a state court or county court established by the
 Legislature by statute for a combined total of [court of record
 together] at least ten years; and
 (5)  during the time required by Subdivision (4) of
 this subsection has not had the person's license to practice law
 revoked, suspended, or subject to a probated suspension.
 SECTION 2.  Section 7, Article V, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.  (a)  The State shall be divided into judicial
 districts, with each district having one or more Judges as may be
 provided by law or by this Constitution.
 (b)  Each district judge shall be elected by the qualified
 voters at a General Election.  To be eligible for appointment or
 election as a district judge, a person must:
 (1)  [and shall] be a citizen of the United States and a
 resident of this State;
 (2)  be[, who is] licensed to practice law in this
 State;
 (3)  have [and has] been a practicing lawyer or a Judge
 of a Court in this State, or both combined, for eight [four (4)]
 years next preceding the judge's [his] election, during which time
 the judge's license to practice law has not been revoked,
 suspended, or subject to a probated suspension;
 (4)  have [who has] resided in the district in which the
 judge [he] was elected for two [(2)] years next preceding the [his]
 election;[,] and
 (5)  [who shall] reside in the [his] district during
 the judge's [his] term of office.
 (c)  A district judge shall [and] hold the [his] office for
 the term [period] of four [(4)] years[,] and [who] shall receive for
 the judge's [his] services an annual salary to be fixed by the
 Legislature.
 (d)  A District [The] Court shall conduct its proceedings at
 the county seat of the county in which the case is pending, except
 as otherwise provided by law. The Court [He] shall hold the regular
 terms [of his Court] at the County Seat of each County in the
 Court's [his] district in such manner as may be prescribed by law.
 The Legislature shall have power by General or Special Laws to make
 such provisions concerning the terms or sessions of each District
 Court as it may deem necessary.
 (e)  The Legislature shall also provide for the holding of
 District Court when the Judge thereof is absent, or is from any
 cause disabled or disqualified from presiding.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, changing the eligibility requirements for a
 justice of the supreme court, a judge of the court of criminal
 appeals, a justice of a court of appeals, and a district judge.
 (b)  The amendment to Section 2(b), Article V, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2022, and applies only to a
 chief justice or other justice of the supreme court, a presiding
 judge or other judge of the court of criminal appeals, or a chief
 justice or other justice of a court of appeals who is first elected
 for a term that begins on or after January 1, 2025, or who is
 appointed on or after that date.
 (c)  The amendment to Section 7, Article V, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2022, and applies only to a
 district judge who is first elected for a term that begins on or
 after January 1, 2025, or who is appointed on or after that date.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment changing the
 eligibility requirements for a justice of the supreme court, a
 judge of the court of criminal appeals, a justice of a court of
 appeals, and a district judge."