Texas 2021 87th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB183 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/09/2021

                    By: Howard H.B. No. 183


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the task force on asylum-seeking
 migrants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 403, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter R to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER R. TASK FORCE ON ASYLUM-SEEKING MIGRANTS
 Sec. 403.501.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Asylum-seeking migrant" means a person who is
 seeking asylum in the United States and who has been released into a
 community in this state by:
 (A)  the Office of Refugee Resettlement;
 (B)  United States Customs and Border Protection
 or United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, pending an
 immigration hearing;
 C)  the Department of Public Safety; or
 (D)  any other state or federal law enforcement
 agency stationed at the border.
 (2)  "Task force" means the task force on
 asylum-seeking migrants.
 Sec. 403.502.  ESTABLISHMENT; PURPOSES. The task force on
 asylum-seeking migrants is established to:
 (1)  study the humanitarian and fiscal impacts of the
 presence of asylum-seeking migrants in this state related to:
 (a)  public education and school districts;
 (b)  open-enrollment charter schools;
 (c)  institutions of higher education;
 (d)  the provision of health and human services
 and child protection;
 e)  the Texas Workforce Commission;
 f)  the Texas Department of Criminal Justice as
 well as the Texas Juvenile Justice Department, issues studied by
 the Task Force shall include, but is not limited to, information
 pertaining to:
 (f-1)  human trafficking;
 (f-2)  sex trafficking; and
 (f-3)  sexual assault; or
 (g)  other areas the Task Force determines to be
 relevant in the production of the report.
 (2)  produce a report outlining the status of
 asylum-seeking migrants in this state and distribute that report to
 state officials.
 Sec. 403.503.  COMPOSITION. The task force is composed of
 twelve members to be appointed by the comptroller as follows:
 (1)  one representative of a faith-based organization
 providing direct services to asylum-seeking migrants in this state;
 (2)  one representative of a community-based
 organization providing direct services to asylum-seeking migrants
 in this state;
 (3)  one member who is a superintendent of a school
 district from the border region of Texas;
 (4)  one representative of a law enforcement agency;
 (5)  one representative of the Texas Education Agency;
 (6)  one representative of the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (7)  one representative of the comptroller;
 (8)  one representative of the Texas Higher Education
 Coordination Board;
 (9)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice;
 (10)  one representative of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department; and
 (11)  one member from the Texas House and Texas Senate
 who represent a region of the border.
 Sec. 403.504.  MEETINGS. (a) The task force shall meet at
 least three times each year and may hold additional meetings in
 person or by conference call if necessary.
 (b)  Section 551.125 applies to a meeting held by conference
 call under this section, except that Section 551.125(b) does not
 apply.
 Sec. 403.505.  COMPENSATION. A member of the task force may
 not receive compensation for service on the task force.
 Sec. 403.506.  REPORT. (a) Using funds available to the
 task force under Section 403.507, the task force shall partner with
 an independent third party to produce a report outlining the status
 of asylum-seeking migrants in this state.
 (b)  The task force shall submit the report to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 comptroller no later than December 1, 2022 and December 31, 2023.
 Sec. 403.507.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS.  The
 comptroller may accept on behalf of the task force a gift, grant, or
 donation from any source to carry out the purposes of this
 subchapter. Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 subchapter, the comptroller is not required to convene the task
 force to produce the report if sufficient private gifts, grants, or
 donations are not available.
 Sec. 403.508.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and
 this subchapter expires January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 31, 2021, the
 comptroller of public accounts shall, subject to Section 403.507,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, convene the task force
 required under Subchapter R, Chapter 403, Government Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.