Texas 2021 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB26 Introduced / Bill

Filed 08/06/2021

                    By: Toth H.B. No. 26


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a forensic audit of 2020 election results in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 16, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 280 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 280. FORENSIC AUDIT OF 2020 GENERAL ELECTION
 Sec. 280.001.  FORENSIC AUDIT OF 2020 GENERAL ELECTION. (a)
 The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint an independent third party to conduct
 a forensic audit of the general election that took place on November
 3, 2020.
 (b)  The independent third party appointed under Subsection
 (a) shall audit every precinct in each county with a population of
 415,000 or more.
 (c)  The audit under this section must begin not later than
 November 1, 2021, and be completed not later than February 1, 2022.
 (d)  Not later than March 1, 2022, the independent third
 party conducting the audit under this section shall submit a report
 to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and each member of the legislature detailing any
 anomalies or discrepancies in voter data, ballot data, or
 tabulation.
 (e)  This chapter expires April 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.