Texas 2021 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR62 Introduced / Bill

Filed 08/11/2021

                    87S20598 BK-D
 By: Guillen H.R. No. 62


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Over the course of their lives, Lucila and Rodolfo
 Cantu shared an enduring love story, and their family is
 celebrating the couple's legacy as they reflect on the passing of
 Mrs. Cantu on May 15, 2019, at the age of 72, and on the passing of
 Mr. Cantu on September 14, 2016, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Cantu enjoyed a long and rewarding
 marriage that spanned five decades; they devotedly raised three
 sons, Robert, Richard, and Rudy, and their cherished family later
 grew to include numerous grandchildren and a great-grandson; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Pedro and Theresa Cantu, Roy Cantu was
 born in Los Fresnos on March 9, 1945, and he grew up with four
 brothers, Hector, Arturo, Oscar, and Joel; he graduated from Los
 Fresnos High School in 1964 and went on to serve in the U.S. Air
 Force, where he attained the rank of staff sergeant before
 receiving an honorable discharge in 1969; he attended Texas
 Southmost College in Brownsville, Miami Dade Junior College, Texas
 A&I University, and Pan American University; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Cantu began his career at the Bank of South
 Texas in Alice and subsequently held a number of leadership
 positions with First National Bank in Rio Grande City,
 International Bank of Commerce, and Lone Star National Bank; he
 then worked for the City of McAllen, where he served as director of
 the EB5 program for the McAllen Economic Development Corporation,
 and in his final years, he was employed with Best Health Home Care
 Company Incorporated; and
 WHEREAS, The former Lucy Silva was born in Salineno on
 September 15, 1946, to Juan and Teresa Silva, and she grew up with
 the companionship of three siblings, Eloy, Lilia, and Idalia; after
 graduating from McAllen High School in 1965, she attended Texas A&I
 University and Pan American University; she went on to work for more
 than 15 years at her son's firm, the Law Office of Richard A. Cantu,
 P.C.; and
 WHEREAS, The couple were also deeply involved in their
 community; Mr. Cantu was a former president of the Rio Grande City
 Rotary Club, the Immaculate Conception Parent-Teacher
 Organization, and the Starr County Youth Fair Association, as well
 as a member of the Rio Grande City Chamber of Commerce and Knights
 of Columbus; Mrs. Cantu served in the Florence J. Scott Study Club,
 Beta Sigma Phi Sorority, Red Hatter's Club, Bunco Club, and several
 parent-teacher organizations; together, they belonged to the Lions
 Club of Alice, the International Order of Alhambra, and Club de
 Amistad; and
 WHEREAS, Roy and Lucy Cantu set an inspiring example through
 their great devotion to each other and to their family, and they
 will forever hold a special place in the hearts of all those who
 held them dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Lucila and Rodolfo Cantu and extend heartfelt sympathy to their
 loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Roy and
 Lucy Cantu.