H.R. No. 62 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Over the course of their lives, Lucila and Rodolfo Cantu shared an enduring love story, and their family is celebrating the couple's legacy as they reflect on the passing of Mrs. Cantu on May 15, 2019, at the age of 72, and on the passing of Mr. Cantu on September 14, 2016, at the age of 71; and WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Cantu enjoyed a long and rewarding marriage that spanned five decades; they devotedly raised three sons, Robert, Richard, and Rudy, and their cherished family later grew to include numerous grandchildren and a great-grandson; and WHEREAS, The son of Pedro and Theresa Cantu, Roy Cantu was born in Los Fresnos on March 9, 1945, and he grew up with four brothers, Hector, Arturo, Oscar, and Joel; he graduated from Los Fresnos High School in 1964 and went on to serve in the U.S. Air Force, where he attained the rank of staff sergeant before receiving an honorable discharge in 1969; he attended Texas Southmost College in Brownsville, Miami Dade Junior College, Texas A&I University, and Pan American University; and WHEREAS, Mr. Cantu began his career at the Bank of South Texas in Alice and subsequently held a number of leadership positions with First National Bank in Rio Grande City, International Bank of Commerce, and Lone Star National Bank; he then worked for the City of McAllen, where he served as director of the EB5 program for the McAllen Economic Development Corporation, and in his final years, he was employed with Best Health Home Care Company Incorporated; and WHEREAS, The former Lucy Silva was born in Salineno on September 15, 1946, to Juan and Teresa Silva, and she grew up with the companionship of three siblings, Eloy, Lilia, and Idalia; after graduating from McAllen High School in 1965, she attended Texas A&I University and Pan American University; she went on to work for more than 15 years at her son's firm, the Law Office of Richard A. Cantu, P.C.; and WHEREAS, The couple were also deeply involved in their community; Mr. Cantu was a former president of the Rio Grande City Rotary Club, the Immaculate Conception Parent-Teacher Organization, and the Starr County Youth Fair Association, as well as a member of the Rio Grande City Chamber of Commerce and Knights of Columbus; Mrs. Cantu served in the Florence J. Scott Study Club, Beta Sigma Phi Sorority, Red Hatter's Club, Bunco Club, and several parent-teacher organizations; together, they belonged to the Lions Club of Alice, the International Order of Alhambra, and Club de Amistad; and WHEREAS, Roy and Lucy Cantu set an inspiring example through their great devotion to each other and to their family, and they will forever hold a special place in the hearts of all those who held them dear; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Lucila and Rodolfo Cantu and extend heartfelt sympathy to their loved ones; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Roy and Lucy Cantu. Guillen ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 62 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on August 30, 2021. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House