Texas 2021 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SJR1 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 08/09/2021

                    By: Birdwell S.J.R. No. 1
 (In the Senate - Filed August 6, 2021; August 7, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Special Committee on Constitutional
 Issues; August 9, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; August 9, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the determination
 of a quorum of the senate or house of representatives.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 10, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 10.  A majority [Two-thirds] of the members of each
 House of the Legislature shall constitute a quorum to do business,
 but a smaller number may adjourn from day to day, and compel the
 attendance of absent members, in such manner and under such
 penalties as each House may provide.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2022.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment to provide that a
 majority of the members of the senate or house of representatives of
 the Texas Legislature constitutes a quorum for that house to do
 business."
 * * * * *