Texas 2021 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB17 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/08/2021

                    By: Toth H.B. No. 17


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a forensic audit of 2020 election results in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 16, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 280 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 280. FORENSIC AUDIT OF 2020 GENERAL ELECTION
 Sec. 280.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Majority precinct" means a precinct in which the
 candidate who received the greatest number of votes in the most
 recent presidential election is the same candidate who received the
 greatest number of votes in the majority of precincts in the county
 in the same election.
 (2)  "Minority precinct" means a precinct in which the
 candidate who received the greatest number of votes in the most
 recent presidential election is not the candidate who received the
 greatest number of votes in the majority of precincts in the county
 in the same election.
 Sec. 280.002.  FORENSIC AUDIT OF 2020 GENERAL ELECTION. (a)
 The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint an independent third party to conduct
 a forensic audit of the general election that took place on November
 3, 2020.
 (b)  The independent third party appointed under this
 section shall audit certain precincts in each county with a
 population of 415,000 or more, as described by Subsection (c).
 (c)  The independent third party appointed under this
 section shall audit the following precincts:
 (1)  each minority precinct from a county described by
 Subsection (b); and
 (2)  a number of randomly selected majority precincts
 from a county described by Subsection (b) equal to the number of
 minority precincts audited in that same county under Subdivision
 (1).
 (d)  The audit under this section shall include an audit of
 precinct election records, as defined by Section 66.002.
 (e)  For each county audited under this section, a
 representative of the secretary of state and the county clerk shall
 oversee the independent third party appointed under this section to
 ensure a proper chain of custody is maintained and documented for
 each voting system involved in the audit.
 (f)  The secretary of state shall implement a video
 surveillance system that retains a record of all areas in which
 audit activity takes place for the duration of the audit. The
 secretary of state shall provide a live video stream of any audit
 activity recorded under this subsection on the Internet website of
 the secretary of state.
 (g)  The independent third party appointed under this
 section may accept and use donations from any public or private
 source to fund the audit.
 (h)  The audit under this section must begin not later than
 November 1, 2021, and be completed not later than February 1, 2022.
 (i)  Not later than March 1, 2022, the independent third
 party conducting the audit under this section shall submit a report
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, the secretary of state, and each member of the
 legislature detailing any anomalies or discrepancies in voter data,
 ballot data, or tabulation.
 (j)  The secretary of state shall publish the report under
 Subsection (i) on the Internet website of the secretary of state.
 (k)  This chapter expires April 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.