Texas 2021 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR57 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/18/2021

                    H.R. No. 57


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of the Most Reverend Raymundo J. Peña,
 bishop emeritus of the Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, on
 September 24, 2021, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Cosme and Elisa Peña, Raymundo Peña was
 born in Corpus Christi on February 19, 1934, and he grew up in
 Robstown; answering his call to the priesthood, he entered the
 St. John's and Assumption Seminaries in San Antonio and was
 ordained on May 25, 1957, at the Corpus Christi Cathedral; he served
 in parish posts as a diocesan youth director and as editor of the
 Texas Gulf Coast Catholic; and
 WHEREAS, Ordained as a bishop in 1976, this esteemed
 clergyman was named the auxiliary bishop for the Archdiocese of San
 Antonio that same year and also served as administrator; in 1980, he
 embarked on a 15-year tenure as bishop for the Catholic Diocese of
 El Paso; among his many accomplishments, he founded the Progress:
 Catholic Ministry Appeal and the Rio Grande Catholic, the official
 newspaper of the El Paso diocese; he also helped develop the Tepeyac
 Institute, which offers training for church ministry; and
 WHEREAS, In 1995, the Most Reverend Peña was appointed bishop
 of the Brownsville diocese; nearly a decade and a half later, in
 2009, he retired as the longest-serving active Hispanic bishop in
 the U.S.; an admired leader in the Catholic church, he chaired
 committees that focused on the concerns of Hispanics in the United
 States and Latin America, and he was a synod father for the Special
 Assembly for America of the Synod of Bishops; he also tirelessly
 advocated for the rights of immigrants and strove to promote unity
 along the border between Mexico and the U.S.; during his years in
 the ministry, he faithfully practiced his motto of "Haz todo con
 amor," which means "Let all that you do be done in love"; and
 WHEREAS, Though it is impossible to gauge the full effect of
 one person's life, some individuals leave their unmistakable mark
 on the world as they move through it, and Raymundo Peña's record of
 good works will continue to resonate for years to come; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of the Most Reverend Raymundo J. Peña and extend heartfelt sympathy
 to his loved ones and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the Catholic Archives of Texas and that when the Texas
 House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of
 the Most Reverend Raymundo Peña.
 Lucio III
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 57 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on October 14, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House