Texas 2021 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR90 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/18/2021

                    By: Hughes S.R. No. 90


 SENATE RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their
 memories of Jerry and Joyce Houston of Tyler, who passed away on
 September 16, 2021; and
 WHEREAS, The son of John Bradford Houston and Jewell
 Juanita Houston, Jerry Franklin Houston was born in Chandler on
 May 22, 1929; the former Joyce Laverne Hobbs was born to Julius D.
 Hobbs and Ida Bell Leavels in Ben Wheeler on August 17, 1930; they
 both attended Chandler High School, and when she asked him if she
 could catch a ride on his bicycle during the lunch hour, romance
 bloomed; the couple married on October 8, 1948, and they became
 the proud parents of two children, Garry and Janet; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Houston served his country in the U.S. Navy
 from 1952 to 1954; after attending Henderson County Junior
 College, he earned his master's degree in education from Texas
 A&M University-Commerce; he spent the first 24 years of his
 career at Harmony High School in Upshur County, where he was a
 teacher, coach, and principal; subsequently, he joined the
 Brownsboro Independent School District and worked for eight
 years as athletic director and for 15 years as principal of
 Chandler Elementary School; Mrs. Houston was employed by
 Brownsboro Junior High School as a secretary for 21 years; and
 WHEREAS, Following their retirement, the Houstons
 remained active in their community; they were valued members of
 Rock Hill Baptist Church, and Mr. Houston served as a deacon, a
 role he held for a total of 60 years at the churches they
 attended; in his leisure time, he loved to go fishing, and
 Mrs. Houston enjoyed cooking and tending to her flowers; they
 both adored watching the athletic events of their grandchildren,
 Joanna, Swaide, Lexie Jo, Matthew, and Timothy; eventually,
 their treasured family grew to include four great-grandchildren,
 Greyson, Hadley, Adam, and Nathan; and
 WHEREAS, The life shared by Jerry and Joyce Houston was
 centered around their loved ones, their faith, and their
 community, and they will forever be remembered with admiration
 and affection by all who were fortunate enough to know them; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the 87th Texas Legislature,
 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the lives of Jerry
 Franklin Houston and Joyce Laverne Houston and extend sincere
 condolences to all who mourn their passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Jerry and Joyce Houston.