Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1193 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Turner, Jones of Dallas (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1193
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting housing discrimination by a property
 owners' association against a residential tenant based on the
 tenant's method of payment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 202, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 202.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.024.  DISCRIMINATION AGAINST TENANT BASED ON METHOD
 OF PAYMENT PROHIBITED. (a)  In this section, "method of payment"
 includes payment made in whole or in part by:
 (1)  a housing choice voucher under Section 8, United
 States Housing Act of 1937 (42 U.S.C. Section 1437f); or
 (2)  any other federal or state or local housing
 assistance provided to a person or to a property owner on behalf of
 a person, including rental vouchers, rental assistance, or rental
 subsidies from a nongovernmental organization.
 (b)  A property owners' association may not include or
 enforce a provision in a dedicatory instrument that prohibits or
 restricts a property owner from renting a dwelling to a person based
 on the person's method of payment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *