Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1275 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    By: Plesa, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1275
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2023;
 April 27, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures for the issuance of personal identification
 certificates to certain persons 65 years of age or older whose
 driver's licenses are surrendered.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.101, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (n) to read as follows:
 (n)  The department shall adopt procedures to allow a person
 who is 65 years of age or older and possesses a driver's license
 that is compliant with the federal REAL ID program to apply for a
 personal identification certificate online or by phone if the
 person surrenders the person's driver's license in a manner
 prescribed by the department. The procedures:
 (1)  must be in compliance with federal guidelines
 governing the issuance of identity documents; and
 (2)  may require the person issued a personal
 identification certificate to update information previously
 provided to the department under Section 521.142.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *