Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1287 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2023

                    88R20099 SCP-D
 By: Guillen, Ortega, Flores, Hernandez, H.B. No. 1287
 Plesa, et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1287:
 By:  Shaheen C.S.H.B. No. 1287


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to adjusting for inflation the maximum amount of a motor
 vehicle excluded in determining eligibility for the supplemental
 nutrition assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 33.0215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.0215.  INFLATION ADJUSTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLE VALUE
 EXCLUDED IN DETERMINING SNAP ELIGIBILITY. (a)  Not later than
 August 1 of each odd-numbered year, the executive commissioner
 shall:
 (1)  determine, in the manner specified by Subsection
 (c), whether the maximum amount of the fair market value of a motor
 vehicle that may be excluded from the resources of an applicant's
 household for purposes of determining the applicant's eligibility
 for supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits, including
 eligibility determined in accordance with 7 C.F.R. Section
 273.2(j), should be adjusted for inflation; and
 (2)  if the executive commissioner determines under
 Subdivision (1) that the maximum amount should be adjusted, submit
 to each member of the Legislative Budget Board a recommendation for
 the adjustment for the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1
 of that odd-numbered year.
 (b)  Not later than September 1 of the odd-numbered year in
 which the members of the Legislative Budget Board receive a
 recommendation under Subsection (a), the board shall approve or
 deny the recommendation and provide written notice to the executive
 commissioner of the approval or denial.  The recommendation is
 considered approved if the board does not provide written notice of
 the approval or denial on or before September 1.  If the board
 denies the recommendation, the maximum amount of the fair market
 value of a motor vehicle that may be excluded from an applicant's
 household resources remains the same as the amount excluded during
 the preceding state fiscal biennium.
 (c)  If the Legislative Budget Board approves a
 recommendation for an adjustment under Subsection (b), the
 commission shall, not later than October 1 of the odd-numbered year
 for which the recommendation was made, increase or decrease for
 that state fiscal biennium beginning September 1 of that year the
 maximum amount of the fair market value of a motor vehicle described
 by Subsection (a) that may be excluded from an applicant's
 household resources to reflect the percentage difference between:
 (1)  the average index level set by the Bureau of Labor
 Statistics; and
 (2)  the new vehicles index of the Consumer Price Index
 for All Urban Consumers published by the Bureau of Labor Statistics
 or its successor index during the most recent 12-month period
 ending in June.
 (d)  In calculating the maximum amount of the fair market
 value of a motor vehicle described by Subsection (a) that may be
 excluded from an applicant's household resources and
 notwithstanding Subsection (c), the commission shall ensure that
 the maximum excluded amounts of the first household vehicle and
 each additional household vehicle remain proportionate to each
 other in the same proportion as the excluded amounts for those
 vehicles in effect on August 31, 2021.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the executive
 commissioner is not required to make a determination or
 recommendation under that subsection until August 1, 2025, for the
 state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2025.
 (f)  Notwithstanding this section, not later than October 1,
 2023, and for the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1,
 2023, the commission shall adjust for inflation in the manner
 specified by Subsection (c) the maximum amount of the fair market
 value of a motor vehicle that may be excluded from the resources of
 an applicant's household for purposes of determining the
 applicant's eligibility for supplemental nutrition assistance
 program benefits, including eligibility determined in accordance
 with 7 C.F.R. Section 273.2(j).  In calculating the maximum amount
 under this subsection, the commission shall comply with Subsection
 (d).
 (g)  This subsection and Subsections (e) and (f) expire
 September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 initial determination or recertification of eligibility of a person
 for the supplemental nutrition assistance program under Chapter 33,
 Human Resources Code, that is made on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.