Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1287 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

                    By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 1287
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2023;
 April 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1287 By:  Blanco


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 KolkhorstX
 PerryX
 BlancoX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 LaMantiaX
 MilesX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exclusion of certain resources in determining
 eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 33.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.021.  EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN RESOURCES IN DETERMINING
 SNAP ELIGIBILITY. In determining the eligibility of an applicant
 for or recertifying the eligibility of a recipient of supplemental
 nutrition assistance program benefits, the commission may not
 consider as resources the value of a motor vehicle in which the
 applicant or recipient or a member of the applicant's or recipient's
 household has an ownership interest up to:
 (1)  $22,500 for the first vehicle; and
 (2)  $8,700 for each additional vehicle.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 determination of eligibility, including an initial determination
 of eligibility, a determination of eligibility based on a reported
 change submitted to the Health and Human Services Commission, or a
 recertification of eligibility, of a person for the supplemental
 nutrition assistance program under Chapter 33, Human Resources
 Code, that is made on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *