Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1305 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Hefner (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 1305
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 19 as the
 Mildred McMillan Garrett Memorial Bridge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.216 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.216.  MILDRED MCMILLAN GARRETT MEMORIAL BRIDGE.
 (a) The State Highway 19 bridge crossing Lake Fork Reservoir in
 Rains County is designated as the Mildred McMillan Garrett Memorial
 Bridge.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Mildred McMillan Garrett Memorial Bridge and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the bridge.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *