Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1330 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Morales of Maverick (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 1330
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a grant program for public improvement projects for
 unincorporated communities in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 12, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 388 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 388. GRANT PROGRAM FOR UNINCORPORATED COMMUNITIES IN
 CERTAIN COUNTIES
 Sec. 388.001.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to
 a county that:
 (1)  has a population of not more than 3,000;
 (2)  is adjacent to at least three counties with
 populations of less than 10,000; and
 (3)  is located on an international border.
 Sec. 388.002.  IMPROVEMENT PROJECT GRANT PROGRAM. (a) The
 commissioners court of a county by order may establish and
 implement a grant program for the purpose of funding public
 improvement projects to benefit unincorporated communities located
 in the county.
 (b)  A public improvement project includes:
 (1)  the acquisition, construction, or improvement of:
 (A)  sidewalks, streets, roads, or other
 transportation infrastructure;
 (B)  water, wastewater, or drainage facilities or
 improvements; or
 (C)  other public facilities or improvements; and
 (2)  special supplemental services for improvement and
 promotion of the area, including services relating to advertising,
 promotion, health and sanitation, water and wastewater, public
 safety, security, business recruitment, development, recreation,
 and cultural enhancement.
 Sec. 388.003.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The county may
 apply for and accept a gift, grant, or donation from any source to
 fund a public improvement project described by Section 388.002.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *