Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1361 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Morales Shaw, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Eckhardt) H.B. No. 1361
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 4, 2023, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute from Committee on Education by the following
 vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1361 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of liaison officers to assist certain
 students at public institutions of higher education who are
 parents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9357 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9357.  DESIGNATION OF LIAISON OFFICER TO ASSIST
 CERTAIN STUDENTS WHO ARE PARENTS; REPORT. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each institution of higher education shall designate at
 least one employee of the institution to act as a liaison officer
 for current or incoming students at the institution who are the
 parent or guardian of a child younger than 18 years of age.  The
 liaison officer shall provide to the students information regarding
 support services and other resources available to the students at
 the institution, including:
 (1)  resources to access:
 (A)  medical and behavioral health coverage and
 services; and
 (B)  public benefit programs, including programs
 related to food security, affordable housing, and housing
 subsidies;
 (2)  parenting and child care resources;
 (3)  employment assistance;
 (4)  transportation assistance;
 (5)  student academic success strategies; and
 (6)  any other resources developed by the institution
 to assist the students.
 (c)  Not later than May 1 of each academic year, an
 institution of higher education shall submit to the coordinating
 board a report that contains the following information regarding
 students enrolled at the institution for the current academic year
 who are the parent or guardian of a child younger than 18 years of
 age:
 (1)  the number of those students;
 (2)  demographic data, including age, race, sex, and
 ethnicity;
 (3)  academic data, including full-time or part-time
 enrollment status and graduation, transfer, and withdrawal rates;
 and
 (4)  other data as prescribed by coordinating board
 rule.
 (d)  The coordinating board shall adopt rules to administer
 this section, including rules to ensure compliance with federal law
 regarding confidentiality of student medical or educational
 information, including the Health Insurance Portability and
 Accountability Act of 1996 (42 U.S.C. Section 1320d et seq.), the
 Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (20 U.S.C.
 Section 1232g), and any state law relating to the privacy of student
 information.
 SECTION 2.  (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt rules to implement Section 51.9357, Education Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024 academic
 year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *