Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1381 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 1381
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023;
 April 20, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public hearing requirement for a preliminary zoning
 report made by a zoning commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 211.007(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The zoning commission shall make a preliminary report
 and hold at least one public hearing [hearings] on that report
 before submitting a final report to the governing body.  The
 governing body may not hold a public hearing until it receives the
 final report of the zoning commission unless the governing body by
 ordinance provides that a public hearing is to be held, after the
 notice required by Section 211.006(a), jointly with a public
 hearing required to be held by the zoning commission.  In either
 case, the governing body may not take action on the matter until it
 receives the final report of the zoning commission.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a proposal to change a municipal zoning classification made on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  A proposal to change a
 municipal zoning classification made before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the proposal
 was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *