Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1393 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Frank, Capriglione (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1393
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2023;
 May 1, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 1; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 HinojosaX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 FloresX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 KolkhorstX
 NicholsX
 PaxtonX
 PerryX
 SchwertnerX
 WestX
 WhitmireX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an optional service retirement annuity that provides an
 increasing annuity under the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 814, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 814.110 to read as follows:
 Sec. 814.110.  INCREASING ANNUITY OPTION. (a) A member who
 is eligible for a service retirement annuity not reduced because of
 age may select a standard retirement annuity or an optional service
 retirement annuity described by Section 814.108 together with the
 option for an increasing annuity as described by this section.
 (b)  The retirement system shall provide the increasing
 annuity option by reducing the member's annuity for an appropriate
 implementation period beginning immediately after the member's
 retirement and annually increasing the amount of the annuity by two
 percent or by another percentage rate, as determined by the system
 under Subsection (c), for each year during the applicable
 implementation period.
 (c)  The retirement system may offer other increasing
 annuity options similar to the option described by Subsection (b),
 including increasing annuity options providing a different
 percentage rate of increase or a different implementation period.
 (d)  If a member elects to receive an increasing annuity
 option under this section, the member's annuity must be calculated
 to reflect the option selected and be actuarially equivalent to a
 standard or optional service retirement annuity, as applicable,
 that the member would have been entitled to had the member not
 elected to receive the option. The annuity must be computed to
 result in no actuarial loss to the retirement system.
 (e)  The increasing annuity option under this section may be
 elected only once by a member and may not be elected by a retiree. A
 member retiring under the proportionate retirement program under
 Chapter 803 is not eligible for the option.
 (f)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  a disability retirement annuity; or
 (2)  an annuity based on service credited in the
 elected class.
 (g)  Before a retiring member selects an increasing annuity
 option under this section, the retirement system must provide a
 written notice to the member of the amount by which the member's
 annuity will be reduced and the implementation period applicable
 because of that selection. The retirement system shall maintain a
 copy of the notice required under this subsection that is signed by
 the member.
 (h)  The board of trustees may adopt rules for the
 implementation of this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 814.110, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a retirement that occurs on or after
 January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *