Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1423 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

                    By: Campos  (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 1423
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HughesX
 PaxtonX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the expiration of a protective order when the subject of
 the protective order is confined or imprisoned.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 85.025, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  As soon as practicable after the release of a person who
 is the subject of a protective order from confinement or
 imprisonment, the Department of Public Safety shall update the
 statewide law enforcement information system maintained by the
 department to reflect the date that the order will expire following
 the person's release.
 SECTION 2.  Section 85.026, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Each protective order issued under this subtitle must
 specify when the order expires and must provide notice of any
 extensions that may apply to a person who is the subject of the
 order, as a result of any confinement or imprisonment of that
 person.
 SECTION 3.  Section 85.025(d), Family Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a protective order with respect to a person who
 is the subject of the order and who is released from confinement or
 imprisonment on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 85.026(d), Family Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a protective order issued on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *