Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1437 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

                    By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1437
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 22, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1437 By:  Schwertner


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an appraisal process for disputed losses under personal
 automobile or residential property insurance policies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 10, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1813 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1813. APPRAISAL OF DISPUTED LOSSES
 Sec. 1813.001.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a)  This chapter
 applies only to a personal automobile or residential property
 insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this
 state by an insurer, including:
 (1)  a capital stock insurance company;
 (2)  a mutual insurance company;
 (3)  a county mutual insurance company;
 (4)  a Lloyd's plan;
 (5)  a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
 (6)  a farm mutual insurance company;
 (7)  an eligible surplus lines insurer if this state is
 the insured's home state as defined by Section 981.002; and
 (8)  the FAIR Plan Association.
 (b)  This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association;
 or
 (2)  a commercial insurance policy.
 Sec. 1813.002.  RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules
 necessary to implement this chapter.
 Sec. 1813.003.  REQUIRED POLICY PROVISION: APPRAISAL
 PROCESS. (a)  An insurance policy described by Section 1813.001(a)
 must contain an appraisal provision that complies with this
 chapter.
 (b)  The appraisal provision required by this chapter is
 intended to provide a type of dispute resolution process solely to
 determine the amount of loss when that amount is in dispute between
 the policyholder and the insurer.
 Sec. 1813.004.  EFFECT OF APPRAISAL. (a)  An appraisal under
 the provision required by this chapter does not affect any
 applicable policy terms.
 (b)  Except for fraud or material mistake relevant to the
 appraisal, the amount of loss determined by an appraisal under this
 chapter is binding as to the policyholder and the insurer.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 1813, Insurance Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *