Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1553 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1553
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of amusement ride for purposes of
 amusement ride regulation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2151.002(1), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Amusement ride" means a mechanical device that
 carries passengers along, around, or over a fixed or restricted
 course or within a defined area for the purpose of giving the
 passengers amusement, pleasure, or excitement. The term does not
 include:
 (A)  a coin-operated ride that:
 (i)  is manually, mechanically, or
 electrically operated;
 (ii)  is customarily placed in a public
 location; and
 (iii)  does not normally require the
 supervision or services of an operator;
 (B)  nonmechanized playground equipment,
 including a swing, seesaw, stationary spring-mounted animal
 feature, rider-propelled merry-go-round, climber, playground
 slide, trampoline, and physical fitness device; [or]
 (C)  a challenge course or any part of a challenge
 course that is excepted from this chapter under Section 2151.107;
 or
 (D)  a waterslide, even if operated by a
 mechanical device, in which passengers are carried along a course
 that:
 (i)  is less than 200 feet in length;
 (ii)  is substantially constructed from
 vinyl or vinyl coated polyester; and
 (iii)  is not mechanically inflated using a
 continuous airflow device [if the person who operates the challenge
 course has an insurance policy currently in effect written by an
 insurance company authorized to do business in this state or by a
 surplus lines insurer, as defined by Chapter 981, Insurance Code,
 or has an independently procured policy subject to Chapter 101,
 Insurance Code, insuring the operator against liability for injury
 to persons arising out of the use of the challenge course, in an
 amount not less than:
 [(i)  for facilities with a fixed location:
 [(a)  $100,000 bodily injury and
 $50,000 property damage per occurrence, with a $300,000 annual
 aggregate; or
 [(b)  a $150,000 per occurrence
 combined single limit, with a $300,000 annual aggregate; and
 [(ii)  for facilities other than those with
 a fixed location:
 [(a)  $1,000,000 bodily injury and
 $500,000 property damage per occurrence; or
 [(b)  $1,500,000 per occurrence
 combined single limit].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *