Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1598 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

                    By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1598
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2023;
 May 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 PerryX
 HancockX
 BlancoX
 FloresX
 GutierrezX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 SparksX
 SpringerX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to local government and other political subdivision
 regulation of certain solid waste facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 361.095, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.095.  LOCAL PERMITS FOR [APPLICANT FOR] HAZARDOUS
 WASTE MANAGEMENT AND MUNICIPAL SOLID WASTE FACILITIES [FACILITY
 PERMIT EXEMPT FROM LOCAL PERMIT]. (a) An applicant for a permit
 under this subchapter is not:
 (1)  required to obtain a permit for the siting,
 construction, or operation of a hazardous waste management facility
 from a local government or other political subdivision of the
 state; or
 (2)  required to obtain a permit for the siting,
 construction, or operation of a municipal solid waste facility from
 a local government or other political subdivision of the state as a
 prerequisite to a permit being issued by the commission.
 (b)  A local government or other political subdivision of the
 state may not adopt a rule, order, or ordinance that conflicts with
 or is inconsistent with:
 (1)  the requirements for hazardous waste management or
 municipal solid waste facilities as specified by:
 (A)  the rules of the commission; or
 (B)  [by] a permit issued by the commission; or
 (2)  the requirements for municipal solid waste
 facilities under Section 361.011.
 (c)  In an action to enforce a rule, order, or ordinance of a
 local government or other political subdivision, the burden is on
 the facility owner or operator or on the applicant to demonstrate
 conflict or inconsistency with state requirements.
 (d)  The validity or applicability of a rule, order, or
 ordinance of a local government or other political subdivision may
 be determined in an action for declaratory judgment under Chapter
 37, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, if it is alleged that the
 rule, order, or ordinance, or its threatened application,
 interferes with, [or] impairs, or threatens to interfere with or
 impair, the legal rights or privileges of the plaintiff concerning
 an issued permit, an application for a permit, or the issuance of a
 permit for the siting, construction, or operation of a hazardous
 waste management or municipal solid waste facility.
 (e)  The local government or other political subdivision
 whose rule, order, or ordinance is being questioned shall be made a
 party to the action. The commission shall be given written notice
 by certified mail of the pendency of the action, and the commission
 may become a party to the action.
 (f)  A declaratory judgment may be rendered even if the
 plaintiff has requested the commission, the local government or
 political subdivision, or another court to determine the validity
 or applicability of the rule, order, or ordinance in question.
 (g)  This section may not be construed to prevent or limit
 the right of:
 (1)  a county or municipality to exercise the authority
 granted under Section 363.112 to prohibit the processing or
 disposal of municipal solid waste;
 (2)  a county to exercise the authority granted under
 Section 364.012 to prohibit the disposal of municipal solid waste;
 or
 (3)  a local government or other political subdivision
 to adopt or enforce a rule, order, or ordinance under the authority
 of the National Flood Insurance Program governing permits or other
 approvals for the development of land in areas prone to floods or
 mudslides.
 SECTION 2.  Section 361.095, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an order, ordinance, or other
 regulation related to the siting or location of a solid waste
 disposal facility adopted by a local government or other political
 subdivision after the effective date of this Act. An order,
 ordinance, or other regulation related to the siting or location of
 a solid waste disposal facility adopted before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date it was
 adopted, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *