By: Burns (Senate Sponsor - King) H.B. No. 1661 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023; May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the age limit for a beginning position in a police department under municipal civil service. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 143.023(c), Local Government Code, is repealed. SECTION 2. The heading to Section 143.083, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 143.083. EMERGENCY APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY FIRE FIGHTERS [AND POLICE OFFICERS]. SECTION 3. Section 143.083(a), Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) If a municipality is unable to recruit qualified fire fighters [or police officers] because of the maximum age limit prescribed by Section 143.023 and the municipality's governing body finds that this inability creates an emergency, the commission shall recommend to the governing body additional rules governing the temporary employment of persons who are 36 years of age or older. SECTION 4. Section 143.084, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 143.084. CIVIL SERVICE STATUS AND PENSION BENEFITS FOR CERTAIN FIRE FIGHTERS [AND POLICE OFFICERS]. (a) Each fire fighter [or police officer] who, since December 31, 1969, has been continuously employed as a temporary employee under the provision codified as Section 143.083 has the full status of a civil service employee with all the rights and privileges granted by Section 143.005. (b) A fire fighter [or police officer] covered by Subsection (a) is eligible to participate in earned pension benefits. The person may buy back service credits in the pension fund in which the permanent fire fighters [or police officers] in the department have participated since that person's employment. The credits may be bought at a rate determined by the actuary of the affected pension fund. SECTION 5. Section 143.084, Local Government Code, as amended by this Act, does not affect the civil service status or eligibility for pension benefits of a police officer to whom that section applied immediately before the effective date of this Act. The civil service status and eligibility for pension benefits of a police officer to whom that section applied is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *