Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1699 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/15/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Flores) H.B. No. 1699
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2023;
 April 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 15, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1699 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Evergreen Underground Water
 Conservation District to impose certain fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 197, Acts of the 59th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1965, is amended by adding Section 22A to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 22A.  FEES. (a)  The Board may impose:
 (1)  a combined production and export fee on water
 exported from the District in an amount not to exceed 20 cents for
 each thousand gallons of water exported from the District; and
 (2)  other fees as authorized by Chapter 36, Water
 Code.
 (b)  A fee collected under Subsection (a)(1) of this section
 may only be used:
 (1)  to maintain the operability of wells significantly
 affected by groundwater export projects; and
 (2)  as authorized by Section 36.122(l), Water Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *