Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1778 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Hinojosa, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 1778
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to certain
 professional sports teams.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.614(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department may issue specialty license plates that
 include the name and insignia of a professional sports team located
 in this state. The department shall design the license plates in
 consultation with the professional sports team and may enter a
 trademark license with the professional sports team or its league
 to implement this section. A license plate may be issued under this
 section only for a professional sports team that:
 (1)  certifies to the department that the requirements
 of Section 504.702 are met; and
 (2)  plays its home games in a facility:
 (A)  constructed or operated, in whole or in part,
 with public funds; or
 (B)  owned, in whole or in part, by a public
 entity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.614(c)(2), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Professional sports team" means a sports team
 that is a member or an affiliate of a member of the National
 Football League, National Basketball Association, [or] National
 Hockey League, Major League Soccer, or a major league baseball
 team.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *