Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1825 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

                    By: Turner, Cook (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1825
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 1; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the consumption, possession, and sale of alcoholic
 beverages at certain performing arts facilities owned by certain
 school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.179(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The board of trustees of a school district may adopt a
 policy allowing the consumption, possession, and sale of an
 alcoholic beverage at an event held at a performing arts facility
 owned by the district if:
 (1)  the facility is leased to a nonprofit organization
 for an event not sponsored or sanctioned by the district; and
 (2)  the district is located in:
 (A)  a county:
 (i) [(A)]  that has a population of not more
 than 300,000; and
 (ii) [(B)] in which a component university
 of the University of Houston System is located; or
 (B)  a county in which is located a facility
 described by Subdivision (1) within two miles of two or more
 stadiums with a capacity of at least 40,000 people.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *