Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1846 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1846
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the skills test required for a commercial driver's
 license for certain commercial learner's permit holders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 522.023(j), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (j)  The department shall [may] administer a skills test to a
 person who holds a commercial learner's permit issued by another
 state or jurisdiction.  On completion, the department shall send
 the skills test results to the state or jurisdiction that issued the
 person's commercial learner's permit.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *