Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1885 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1885
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Transportation Commission to
 establish variable speed limits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.353, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  The commission by rule may establish a variable speed
 limit program to allow the temporary lowering of a prima facie speed
 limit to address inclement weather, congestion, road construction,
 or any other condition that affects the safe and orderly movement of
 traffic on a roadway for which the commission has the authority to
 establish a speed limit.  Notice of a speed limit established under
 the program may be displayed using a stationary or portable
 changeable message sign, as defined by Section 544.013. The
 program may not authorize the lowering of a speed limit to divert
 traffic to a toll road for the purpose of increasing revenue from
 toll charges. A speed limit that is established under the program:
 (1)  must be based on an engineering and traffic
 investigation;
 (2)  may be effective for all or a designated portion of
 the highway and may be effective for any period of the day or night,
 as the Texas Department of Transportation determines necessary;
 (3)  may not be less than 10 miles per hour below the
 prima facie speed limit on the portion of the highway to which it
 applies; and
 (4)  is effective only when the speed limit is posted
 and only if a sign notifying motorists of the change in speed limit
 is posted not less than 500 feet but not more than 1,000 feet before
 the point at which the speed limit begins.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *