Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1898 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

                    By: Jetton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1898
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2023;
 April 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1;
 May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1898 By:  Hancock


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 KolkhorstX
 PerryX
 BlancoX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 LaMantiaX
 MilesX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a grant program to fund the provision by children's
 hospitals of mental and behavioral health services to children in
 this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.09936 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.09936.  GRANT PROGRAM TO FUND MENTAL AND BEHAVIORAL
 HEALTH SERVICES BY CERTAIN CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS.  (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Children's hospital" means a hospital designated
 by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services as a children's
 hospital that is exempted by that federal agency from payment under
 the inpatient prospective payment system under Medicare.
 (2)  "Grant program" means the grant program
 established under Subsection (b).
 (b)  If and to the extent money is specifically appropriated
 to the commission for that purpose, the commission shall establish
 a grant program under which the commission provides grants to
 children's hospitals that the hospitals may, except as provided by
 Subsection (e), use to directly provide mental and behavioral
 health services to children in this state.
 (c)  A children's hospital may apply for a grant under the
 grant program in the form and manner prescribed by the commission.
 (d)  A grant recipient may not use a grant awarded under the
 grant program to:
 (1)  reimburse an expense or pay a cost that a health
 benefit plan or other source, including Medicaid, is obligated to
 reimburse or pay by law or contract; or
 (2)  provide mental health services, including
 treatments or procedures, to a child that affirm the child's
 perception of the child's sex if that perception is inconsistent
 with the child's biological sex.
 (e)  The commission shall monitor and evaluate the use of
 money awarded under the grant program to ensure compliance with
 this section.
 (f)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the commission shall submit a biennial report to the legislature on
 the performance of the grant program during the preceding two state
 fiscal years. The report must include the name of each grant
 recipient awarded a grant under the program and the amount of the
 recipient's award during the fiscal years covered by the report.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *