Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1900 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smithee, Perez, Hull H.B. No. 1900
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2023;
 April 24, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 10, 2023, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1900 By:  Kolkhorst


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of cancellation or nonrenewal of a property and
 casualty insurance policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.104(f), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  An insurer may cancel a personal automobile insurance
 policy effective on any 12-month anniversary of the original
 effective date of the policy if the insurer mails to the named
 insured written notice of the cancellation not later than the 60th
 [30th] day before the effective date of the cancellation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 551.105, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 551.105.  NONRENEWAL OF POLICIES; NOTICE REQUIRED.
 Unless the insurer has mailed written notice of nonrenewal or
 renewal with written notice of change in coverage as provided by
 Section 2002.001 to the insured not later than the 60th [30th] day
 before the date on which the insurance policy expires, an insurer
 must renew an insurance policy, at the request of the insured, on
 the expiration of the policy. Notwithstanding the failure of an
 insurer to comply with this section, the policy shall terminate on
 the effective date of any replacement or succeeding insurance
 policy with another carrier with respect to the insured
 (a)  personal automobile, (b)  home, farm, ranch, dwelling,
 duplex, or apartment, or (c)  other real or personal property.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2024. A policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2024, is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *