Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1914 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kacal, Plesa, Slawson H.B. No. 1914
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensatory time accrued by an employee of the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 659.015(k), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (k)  Compensatory time off to which an employee of [a
 correctional officer employed by] the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice is entitled under Subsection (f) must be taken during the
 24-month period following the end of the workweek in which the
 compensatory time was accrued or it lapses.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *