Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1925 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2023

                    By: Harless (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1925
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023;
 April 20, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 3, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 3, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of a health care provider
 participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 299.004.  EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section
 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate
 a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2023].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2023].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *